Case Information: 55249 | |||
Short Caption: | VARNADO (LAVAR) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 44378 , 46248 , 47962 , 51375 , 61957 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C191014 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Saitta | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/19/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/14/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-01151 | |
01/14/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/14/2010 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Saitta. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
01/26/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 10-02205 | |
04/19/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 2. | 10-10187 | |
04/19/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/15/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | 10-18220 | |
08/09/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-19300 | |
08/09/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/17/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 12, 2010. | 10-19300 |