Case Information: 55219 | |||
Short Caption: | PAWELL VS. VENETIAN CASINO RESORT, LLC | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A537866 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/14/2010 / Trost, Janet | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/08/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-00588 | |
01/08/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | ||
01/12/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Seegmiller & Associates - check no. 8393. | ||
01/14/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Janet Trost | 10-01148 | |
02/02/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 10-02799 | |
02/05/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. Fn1[any relief regarding bond for costs on appeal must be sought in the district court]. Fn2[In light of the stipulation for dismissal, we vacate the requirement of filing a docketing statement in this appeal]. CLK- SNP-TH | 10-03382 | |
02/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. | ||
03/08/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 10-06041 |