Case Information: 55252 | |||
Short Caption: | BRASS (GEORGE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51857 , 51870 , 53654 , 61617 , 69623 , 69623-COA , 70875 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C227661 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 10/04/2010 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/14/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 10-01169 | |
01/14/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/27/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/16/09. To Court Reporter: Dalyne Easley. | 10-02330 | |
01/27/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/25/09. To Court Reporter: Kim Tuchman. | 10-02331 | |
01/27/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/14/09, 10/15/09, 10/16/09, 10/19/09, 10/20/09. To Court Reporter: Dalyne Easley. | 10-02332 | |
01/27/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 10/13/09. To Court Reporter: Dalyne Easley. | 10-02333 | |
01/27/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/1/09. To Court Reporter: Dalyne Easley. | 10-02334 | |
01/27/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/23/09. To Court Reporter: Dalyne Easley. | 10-02335 | |
01/29/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-02520 | |
03/25/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Dalyne Easley stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/23/09, 6/01/09, 10/13/09, 10/14/09, 10/15/09, 10/16/09, 10/19/09, 10/20/09, and 12/16/09. | 10-07897 | |
03/30/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kim Tuchman stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/25/09. | 10-08299 | |
05/13/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30) days. | 10-12417 | |
05/13/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due date: June 14, 2010. | 10-12425 | |
06/14/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for a Seven Day Enlargement of Time Within Which to File Opening Brief. | 10-15426 | |
06/16/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Opening brief and appendix due 6/21/10. | 10-15598 | |
06/21/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-16214 | |
06/21/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 10-16220 | |
07/22/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-18887 | |
07/22/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: August 20, 2010. | 10-18889 | |
08/25/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief | 10-21802 | |
08/27/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief with CD-ROM included. | 10-22170 | |
09/23/2010 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | 10-24568 | |
10/04/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 10-25566 | |
10/04/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." | 10-32242 | |
01/04/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-00269 | |
01/04/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/21/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 11, 2011. | 11-00269 |