Case Information: 55253 | |||
Short Caption: | HORIZON FAMILY THERAPY & WELLNESS VS. DIST. CT. (TYLO) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - NONE | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/14/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Perry Spann & Westbrook check no. 29995. | ||
01/14/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 10-01176 | |
01/14/2010 | Other | Other. Received appendix on CD-ROM. | ||
01/19/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. | 10-01399 | |
02/05/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "We deny the petition." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-03277 | |
02/24/2010 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Correspondence re: Withdraw of Counsel (submitted by Mainor Eglet Cottle firm). | 10-04860 | |
03/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 10-04212 | |
03/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Counsel for Real Parties in Interest. The law firm of Mainor Eglet Cottle, LLP, has filed a document in this court indicating that it has withdrawn as counsel for real parties in interest. Because this petition for extraordinary relief was denied on February 5, 2010, and the notice in lieu of remittitur issued on March 3, 2010, no action need be taken by this court with regard to that document. | 10-06604 |