Case Information: 55231 | |||
Short Caption: | SIMMONS (SHANNON) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C247871 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/24/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/11/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-00755 | |
01/11/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/12/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 10-00936 | |
01/21/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law or Order filed 1/13/10. Due Date: 10 days. | 10-01781 | |
03/01/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. District Court Order filed on 1/13/10. Due Date: 10 days. | 10-05279 | |
03/12/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on January 13, 2010. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, Order Denying Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Post Conviction). | 10-06595 | |
03/16/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 10-06905 | |
05/24/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1-2. | 10-13505 | |
05/24/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
05/28/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Suppplemental Record due: 10 days. | 10-13970 | |
06/11/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Letter from District Court Clerk in response to the Order filed on 5/28/10 with attachements. | 10-15128 | |
07/15/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. For the reasons stated in the attached district court order, we "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP fn3[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] | 10-18196 | |
08/09/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-19298 | |
08/09/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/17/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 12, 2010. | 10-19298 |