Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/08/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) (Buzz Stew, LLC) | | 10-00598 |
01/08/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | | |
01/12/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Dana Jonathon Nitz | | 10-00890 |
01/12/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Kermitt L. Waters - check no. 1126. | | |
01/28/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 10-02390 |
02/05/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for cross-appellant.) (City of N. Las Vegas) | | 10-03297 |
02/05/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. (Cross-appeal) | | |
02/05/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. (Buzz Stew, LLC) | | 10-03299 |
03/01/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. | | 10-05381 |
03/10/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Appellant's Motion to File Motion to Stay Payment of Costs in Excess of 10 Pages. | | 10-06173 |
03/10/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appendix to Appellant's Motion to Stay Payment of Costs. Vols. 1 through 10. CD-ROM included. | | 10-06179 |
03/16/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a conference is scheduled for 3/31/10 | | 10-06982 |
03/18/2010 | Motion | Received Response to Motion. (FILED PER ORDER 03/22/10). Received via E-flex. Respondent's Response to Appellant's Motion to Stay Payment of Costs. | | |
03/22/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Second Amended Notice of Appeal. (Buzz Stew, LLC) | | 10-07456 |
03/22/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the stay motion received on March 10, 2010. The clerk of this court shall also filed respondent/cross-appellant's opposition to the stay motion received on March 18, 2010. | | 10-07485 |
03/22/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellant's Motion to Stay Payment of Costs. | | 10-06175 |
03/22/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondent's Response to Appellant's Motion to Stay Payment of Costs. | | 10-07488 |
03/29/2010 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. Appellant's Reply in Support of Motion to Stay Payment of Costs. | | 10-08061 |
04/01/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to 5/27/10 | | 10-08523 |
04/08/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Stay. We deny appellant/cross-respondent's motion. | | 10-09213 |
04/19/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellant/Cross Respondent's Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Stay or Motion to Grant Rehearing on Order Denying Stay. | | 10-10110 |
04/27/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondent's Response to Appellant's Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Stay or Motion to Grant Rehearing on Order Denying Stay | | 10-10812 |
05/10/2010 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. Appellant/Cross-Respondent's Reply Re: Motion to Reconsider Order Denying Stay or Motion to Grant Rehearing on Order Denying Stay. | | 10-12045 |
06/10/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion for Reconsideration. Having considered appellant/cross-respondent's motion for reconsideration of our April 8, 2010, order denying its motion for a stay of the district court's cost award, respondent/cross-appellant's opposition, and appellant/cross-respondent's reply, we conclude that reconsideration is unwarranted. fn1[ To the extent appellant/cross-respondent seeks rehearing of this court's April 8 order, we deny that request. Neither NRAP 40 (rehearing) nor NRAP 40A (en banc reconsideration) apply to procedural orders.] | | 10-14991 |
06/24/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Amended Settlement Status Report. The conference is continued to 7/6/10 | | 10-16540 |
07/07/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. Amended Settlement Program Status Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 10-17504 |
07/14/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant and Respondent: 15 days to request transcripts; Appellant: 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Respondent: 30 days from opening brief to file combined answering brief on appeal and opening brief on cross-appeal. Appellant: 30 days from respondent's combined brief to file combined reply brief on appeal and answering brief on cross-appeal. Respondent: 30 days from appellant's combined brief to file reply brief on cross-appeal. | | 10-18081 |
07/29/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. | | 10-19638 |
07/29/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. of Appellant/Cross-Respondent. Transcripts requested: 4/25/06; 9/3/08; (Howard). 1/12/09; 9/14/09; 10/5/09; 10/12/09; and 11/5/09 (Ramsey). To Court Reporters: Sharon Howard and Michelle Ramsey. | | 10-19661 |
07/29/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/4/09. To Court Reporter: Michelle Ramsey. | | 10-19662 |
07/29/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Amended Certificate of Service (Amended Request and Request for Transcripts). | | 10-19663 |
08/06/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Respondent shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why its cross-appeal should not be dismissed. Appellant may file any reply within ten days from the date that respondent's response is served. Briefing is suspended. | | 10-20375 |
08/13/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellant's Motion for Huneycutt Remand for the Limited Purpose of Modifying the Cost Award | | 10-20956 |
08/26/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause Respondent/Cross-Appellant City of North Las Vegas's Response to Order to Show Cause | | 10-22033 |
09/29/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order of Limited Remand and Dismissing Cross-Appeal. We remand this matter to the district court. District Court Order due: 20 days. The City's cross-appeal is hereby dismissed. | | 10-25049 |
11/08/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Response to 9/29/10 Order. (Attached is the Second Amended Judgment filed in district court on 10/13/10). | | 10-29120 |
11/16/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal/Re-Filing of Appeal/Third Notice of Re-Filing of Appeal/Third Amended Notice of Appeal. | | 10-29889 |
12/27/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Opening brief and appendix due 30 days. | | 10-33661 |
01/21/2011 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Opening Brief and Appendix. (30) days. | | 11-02074 |
01/21/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due date: February 25, 2011. | | 11-02079 |
02/22/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Opening Brief and Appendix. | | 11-05475 |
03/11/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: March 28, 2011. | | 11-07565 |
03/28/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Brief in Excess of 30 Pages. | | 11-09287 |
03/28/2011 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volumes 1-37. | | 11-09289 |
04/11/2011 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension to File Answering Brief. | | 11-10730 |
04/12/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the opening brief received on March 28, 2011. | | 11-10892 |
04/12/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | | 11-10893 |
04/28/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Approving Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. Answering brief due May 27, 2011. | | 11-12570 |
05/18/2011 | Motion | Filed Respondent City of North Las Vegas's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. (30) days. | | 11-14693 |
06/09/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. Respondent: Answering Brief due: June 27, 2011 | | 11-17197 |
06/28/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Brief in Excess of 30 Pages. | | 11-19149 |
07/12/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Excess Pages. We grant the motion and direct the clerk of this court to file the answering brief provisionally received on that same day. | | 11-20798 |
07/12/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | | 11-20799 |
07/26/2011 | Motion | Filed Stiputation for Extension to File Reply Brief. | | 11-22472 |
07/26/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief is due by August 29, 2011. | | 11-22474 |
08/24/2011 | Motion | Filed Appellant Buzz Stew, LLC's Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 11-25829 |
09/07/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief. Appellant: Reply Brief due: September 28, 2011. | | 11-27072 |
09/28/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Reply Brief in Excess of 30 Pages. | | 11-29518 |
10/05/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Excess pages. We grant the motion and direct the clerk of this court to file the reply brief provisionally received in this court on September 28, 2011. | | 11-30432 |
10/05/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | | 11-30433 |
10/05/2011 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
04/26/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for Tuesday, June 5, 2012, at 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas for 60 minutes before the En Banc Court. | | 12-13332 |
05/21/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 12-15956 |
05/25/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Kermitt L. Waters, James L. Leavitt and Autumn L. Waters appearing on behalf of the appellant Buzz Stew). | | 12-16598 |
06/05/2012 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision to the En Banc Court. | | |
07/31/2013 | Brief | Filed Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 13-22533 |
08/06/2013 | Brief | Filed Response to Notice of Supplemental Authorities. | | 13-23070 |
10/10/2014 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Gibbons, C.J., with whom Cherry J., agrees, dissenting. EN BANC | | 14-33779 |
10/24/2014 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Motion to Publish Order of Affirmance. | | 14-35588 |
10/27/2014 | Motion | Filed Motion to Reissue Order as an Opinion. | | 14-35659 |
10/28/2014 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. | | 14-35876 |
10/28/2014 | Filing Fee | Filing fee paid on rehearing. E-Payment $150.00 from Kermitt L. Waters. | | |
11/04/2014 | Motion | Filed Response to: NDOT's Motion to Reissue Order as an Opinion and Respondent's Motion to Publish Order of Affirmance. | | 14-36388 |
11/04/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent: 15 days to file an answer to the petition. | | 14-36468 |
11/20/2014 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Answer to Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. | | 14-38240 |
01/22/2015 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Gibbons, C.J. with whom Cherry, J. agrees, dissenting. | | 15-02402 |
01/29/2015 | Opinion/Non-Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Fn1[We originally resolved this appeal in a nonprecedential order of affirmance. Respondent City of North Las Vegas and nonparty Nevada Department of Transportation filed motions to publish the order as an opinion. We grant the motions and replace our earlier order with this opinion.] Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Hardesty, C.J. Majority: Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Saitta/Pickering. Gibbons, J., with whom Cherry, J., agrees, dissenting. 131 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 1. EN BANC | | 15-03100 |
02/17/2015 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 15-05007 |
02/17/2015 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
03/03/2015 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 20, 2015. | | 15-05007 |
10/20/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter dated October 8, 2015 to Publishers with corrections to recently filed opinions. 55220/(63092/63359)/(63382/63790)/63644/63747/63683/64215/(60944/61329)/62840/63980/64287/62878/64750/55173/56548 | | 15-31913 |