Case Information: 55212 | |||
Short Caption: | BERGER (SEAN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 47088 , 55207 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR050760 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Justice Hardesty for Justice Douglas Justice Douglas for Justice Hardesty | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 12/13/2010 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/07/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 10-00438 | |
01/07/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/07/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/16/09. To Court Reporter: Joan Dotson. | 10-00456 | |
01/20/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 55207/55212. | 10-01564 | |
01/20/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/16/09. To Court Reporter: Joan Dotson. | 10-01598 | |
01/21/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Consolidating Appeals, Redesignating Appeal in Docket No. 55207, and Setting Briefing Schedule. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 40 days. Nos. 55207/55212 (10-01677). | ||
01/26/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Nos. 55207/55212 (10-02142). | ||
01/26/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols. 1 through 2. CD-ROM included with appendix. Nos. 55207/55212 (10-02143). | ||
01/27/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Joan Dotson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/16/09. Nos. 55207/55212. (10-02263) | ||
02/01/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Supplemental Appellant Appendix. Nos. 55207/55212 (10-02709). | ||
02/12/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Nos. 55207/55212 (10-03876). | ||
10/11/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Affirming in Docket No. 55207 and Directing Full Briefing in Docket No. 55212. Opening Brief due: 30 days. Nos. 55207/55212. | 10-26488 | |
11/04/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-28936 | |
11/04/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix Second Supplemental Appendix | 10-28937 | |
12/02/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-31280 | |
12/13/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 10-32374 | |
12/13/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Reply Brief . Third Supplemental Appellant appendix. | 10-32375 | |
12/13/2010 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/Submitted For Decision. | ||
05/12/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." Pickering, J., dissenting. | 11-14177 | |
06/06/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-16445 | |
06/06/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/10/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 7, 2011. | 11-16445 |