judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HARTLEY VS. HARTLEY

Case Information: 55232
Short Caption:HARTLEY VS. HARTLEYCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D113119 Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/12/2010 / Cohen, LarrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/11/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 10-00758
01/11/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
01/11/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days 10-00759
01/12/2010Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Larry J. Cohen 10-00914
01/13/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lynn Shoen. Check No. 3295435.
02/01/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-02700
02/01/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. (Docketing Statement) 10-02701
02/08/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 10-03578
02/10/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a conference is scheduled for 3/23/10 10-03737
03/25/2010MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice. 10-07836
03/26/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- NNP-TH 10-07980
03/26/2010Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.