judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO: GENO N. M.

Case Information: 55233
Short Caption:IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO: GENO N. M.Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 63972
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D415661 Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/11/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Parental Termination/Counsel. (Notice re: parental termination expedited filing schedule mailed to all counsel.) 10-00764
01/11/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court.
01/13/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Kristina Wildeveld. Check No. 1077.
01/13/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Documents from District Court Clerk. Confidential Cover Sheet. (SEALED) 10-01029
01/26/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-02085
02/05/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Request Transcripts. 10-03367
02/05/2010Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter in Response to Notice to Request Transcripts 10-03421
03/24/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/20/09. 10-07719
04/02/2010MotionFiled Motion. Counsel for Appellant Kristina Wildeveld. 10-08662
04/19/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Service. Wildeveld: 10 days to file proof of service on Clifford. 10-10076
04/19/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing for Motion to Withdraw as Appellate Counsel filed April 2, 2010. (In response to Order 4/19/10) 10-10197
04/23/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Child Custody Brief and Appendix. 10-10664
04/26/2010Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. -Letter in Response to the Notice to File Opening Brief filed on April 23, 2010. 10-10786
05/03/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to Withdraw. The clerk of this court shall remove Wildeveld from the docket of this appeal. Clifford M.'s Response due: 30 days. Briefing is suspended. fn1 [We direct the clerk of this court to mail Clifford M. a Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement, Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form, and the Instructions for Civil Litigants Without Attorneys.] 10-11203
06/10/2010MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Submit Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 10-15078
06/15/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Proper Person Appeal Statement. Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement due: August 9, 2010. 10-15546
08/12/2010MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion to Proceed in Proper Person and for Extension of Time to File Brief. 10-20874
10/25/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Proper Person Appeal Statement due: December 13, 2010. 10-27793
12/15/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance and Motion to Request for Extension of Time to File Brief. Representing appellant: Marsha Kimble-Simms of Simms Law Firm, LLC. 10-32828
12/28/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Removing Appeal from Civil Proper Person Pilot Program and Setting Briefing Schedule. This appeal is removed fromt he pilot program. Appellant: 75 days to file the opening brief and appendix. 10-33830
03/01/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Representing appellant Clifford McClain: Jason Bach in place and stead of Marsha F. Kimble-Simms. 11-06157
03/07/2011MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate Appeals and Reset Briefing Schedules to Reflect Consolidation. Nos. 55233/56869. 11-07008
03/11/2011MotionFiled Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal and Opposition to Consolidation. 11-07623
03/16/2011MotionFiled Reply in support of Motion to consolidate appeals and reset briefing schedules to reflect consolidation and opposition to motion to dismiss appeal. Nos. 55233/56869. 11-07977
04/07/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Conditionally Denying Motion to Dismiss, Granting Motion for Consolidation, and Setting Expedited Briefing Schedule. This order denying dismissal of the appeal in Docket No. 55233 is conditioned on the timely filing of appellant's joint opening brief. Opening Brief due: 30 days. Each Respondent's Answering Brief due: 30 days from service of opening brief. Reply Brief due: 10 days from service of answering brief. 11-10409
05/10/2011MotionFiled Motion to Exceed Page Limit on Appellants' Opening Brief. (46) pages. Nos. 55233/56869. 11-13771
05/10/2011AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1. Nos. 55233/56869. 11-13778
05/10/2011AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2. Nos. 55233/56869. 11-13779
05/25/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Leave to Exceed Page Limit. We direct the clerk of this court to file the opening brief received on May 10, 2011. Nos. 55233/56869. 11-15402
05/25/2011BriefFiled Appellants' Opening Brief. Nos. 55233/56869. 11-15404
06/22/2011BriefFiled Respondent's Sharon Langford's Answering Brief. Nos. 55233/56869. 11-18604
06/22/2011AppendixFiled Respondent Sharon Langford's Appendix. Nos. 55233/56869. 11-18605
06/24/2011BriefFiled Respondent State of Nevada's Answering Brief. Nos. 55233/56869. 11-18860
06/24/2011AppendixFiled Respondent's Appendix. 11-18931
07/12/2011Case Status UpdateBriefing Completed/To Screening.
07/26/2011MotionFiled Appellants' Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Reply Brief. Nos. 55233/56869. 11-22467
08/08/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the reply brief received on July 26, 2011. Nos. 55233/56869. 11-23873
08/08/2011BriefFiled Appellants' Reply Brief. Nos. 55233/56869. 11-23874
12/16/2011MotionFiled Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for Appellants. Nos. 55233/56869. 11-38880
03/06/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Appellants shall have 11 days from the date of this order to file and serve a response to this order. Respondents shall have 5 days from the date the appellants' responses are served, to file and serve any replies. Fn1[We defer ruling on attorney Jason Bach's motion to withdraw as counsel of record for appellants in these consolidated appeals]. Nos. 55233/56869. 12-07195
03/15/2012MotionFiled Appellants' Response to Order to Show Cause. 12-08364
03/21/2012MotionFiled Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause Respondent Sharon Langford's Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause 12-08976
03/23/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Deconsolidating Appeals and Directing Appellant Melody N. to Show Cause. We direct the clerk of this court to deconsolidate Docket No. 55233 from Docket No. 56869. Appellant Melody N.: 11 days to show cause why the appeal in Docket No. 56869 should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent Sharon L. may file any reply within 5 days from the date that Melody N.'s response is served. Fn1[We defer ruling on attorney Jason Bach's motion to withdraw as counsel of record for appellants]. Nos. 55233/56869. 12-09399
04/13/2012Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We affirm the district court's order terminating appellant's parental rights." Fn2[In light of this order, we deny as moot attorney Jason Back's motion to withdraw as appellant Clifford M.'s counsel of record.] NNP12C-MC/KP/JH 12-11855
05/10/2012RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 12-14806
05/10/2012Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
05/21/2012RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 15, 2012. 12-14806