Case Information: 51474 | |||
Short Caption: | EMIL (RODNEY) VS. STATE (DEATH PENALTY) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 28463 , 65627 , 73461 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C82176 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Death Penalty - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Gibbons | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/28/2009 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/21/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/21/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. | ||
04/21/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Gibbons. | ||
04/21/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 08-09929 | |
04/30/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-10749 | |
04/30/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 08-10751 | |
08/07/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time within which to File Appellant's Opening Brief. (60 days). | 08-20468 | |
08/22/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief due: October 20, 2008. | 08-21750 | |
10/20/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-26959 | |
10/28/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: November 10, 2008 to file the opening brief. | 08-27611 | |
11/10/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-28685 | |
11/19/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Request to Take Judicial Notice. | 08-29483 | |
11/19/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appellant's Exhibit to Request to Take Judicial Notice. | 08-29484 | |
11/19/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion to Permit Appellant to File an Opening Brief Longer than Thirty Pages. (68 pages). | 08-29486 | |
12/02/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. we grant appellant's motion, and we will take judicial notice of the document. Counsel has also moved this court for a seven-day extension of time within which to file the opening brief and for permission to file an opening brief in excess of the page limitations. Cause appearing, the motions are granted. The clerk of this court shall file appellant's opening brief received on November 19, 2008. | 08-30540 | |
12/02/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-29495 | |
12/02/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 25. | 08-29501 | |
01/06/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 09-00213 | |
01/12/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Answering Brief due: 60 days. | 09-00769 | |
03/16/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request) | 09-06660 | |
03/30/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for an extension of time. Answering brief due 60 days. | 09-07851 | |
05/29/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 09-13503 | |
06/17/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 09-14983 | |
06/23/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension of time. Reply brief due August 13, 2009. | 09-15559 | |
08/12/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 09-19691 | |
08/21/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Appellant: Reply Brief due August 27, 2009. | 09-20439 | |
08/28/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 09-20962 | |
08/28/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/20/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." EN BANC-RP/JH/MD/MC/NS/KP fn2[The Honorable Mark Gibbons, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation of this matter.] | 10-18675 | |
08/09/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Appellant. | 10-20550 | |
09/22/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent: Answer due 15 days. | 10-24400 | |
10/06/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Answer to Petition for Rehearing. | 10-25996 | |
11/17/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 10-30024 | |
12/13/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-32427 | |
12/13/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/28/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 21, 2010. | 10-32427 |