Case Information: 51479 | |||
Short Caption: | FRADY VS. BURCHETTE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Storey Co. - First Judicial District - CV20074 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/28/2008 / Rose, Senior Justice Robert | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/16/2009 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/23/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from The Law Office of Carole M. Pope check no. 3086. | ||
04/23/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-10074 | |
04/28/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Senior Justice Robert E. Rose. | 08-10553 | |
04/30/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on April 22, 2008. Summary Judgment. | 08-10795 | |
05/01/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to be Discharged. | 08-10900 | |
05/02/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. | 08-10958 | |
05/02/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Addendum to Motion. | 08-11021 | |
05/06/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Addendum to Motion served on settlement judge. | 08-11281 | |
05/08/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-11462 | |
05/21/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | 08-12762 | |
06/06/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Filed with attached e-mails. This appeal should be removed from the program. Elderly respondent has discharged attorney, lives in Las Vegas, and wants to proceed in pro per. Her attorney has filed a Motion to be Discharged. | 08-14325 | |
07/03/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. And Reinstating Briefing. Grant Respondent's counsel's motion to withdraw. Remove from the settlement program pursuant to the recommendation of the settlement judge, and reinstate briefing. Appellant: 15 days to file transcript request form and 90 days to file opening brief and appendix. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-17012 | |
07/17/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 08-18355 | |
07/31/2008 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for Stay Form for Parties Without Attorneys. | 08-19887 | |
08/29/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. We elect to treat the "Motion for Stay Form for Parties Without Attorneys" as a motion for full briefing and grant it as such. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of service of appellants' opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. Appellants shall have 30 days from service of respondent's answering brief to file and serve the reply brief, if deemed necessary. fn1[We note that respondent's motion was not accompanied by a properly completed certificate of service. Accordingly, respondent shall have ten days from the date of this order to provide this court with a certificate of service that fully complies with the requirements of NRAP 25(1)(d).] | 08-22338 | |
09/09/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Motion for Stay Form for Parties Without Attorneys. (In response to order filed 8/29/08). | 08-23248 | |
10/01/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-25383 | |
10/01/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 08-25386 | |
11/17/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Filing Answering Brief. We elect to treat the letter received on November 3, 2008, as respondent's answering brief. In this instance only, and in the interest of judicial efficiency, we elect to allow Mr. Burchette to file the brief on respondent's behalf. We direct the clerk to file the answering brief received on November 3, 2008. Reply Brief due: 30 days. | 08-29163 | |
11/17/2008 | Brief | Filed Proper Person Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief received on 11/03/08. | 08-28084 | |
01/13/2009 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed. | ||
02/09/2009 | Letter/Incoming | Received Proper Person Letter. Amending Answer of 10/30/2008. FILED PER ORDER OF 8/25/09. - DETACHED AND FILED AMENDED ANSWER OF 10/30/08.. | 09-03477 | |
03/16/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted for on the record and briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. | 09-06662 | |
03/16/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/25/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn3 [. . .We construe the 2/9/09 letter as a motion and direct the clerk of this court to file respondent's motion and grant her request for leave to file an amended answering brief. The clerk of this court shall detach and file respondent's proposed amended answering brief.] SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | 09-20686 | |
08/25/2009 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Letter. | 09-03477 | |
08/25/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Amending Answer of 10/30/2008. FILED PER ORDER OF 8/25/09. | 09-20688 | |
09/22/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-21154 | |
09/22/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/01/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 25, 2009. | 09-21154 |