Case Information: 51477 | |||
Short Caption: | STATE, DEP'T OF MOTOR VEHICLES VS. HILL | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 07CV00272 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Gibbons | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/03/2009 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/23/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Gibbons. | ||
04/23/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. Government Agency. | ||
04/23/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-10062 | |
04/24/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Documents. It has been determined that this appeal willl not be scheduled for settlement conference. Transcript request form due: 15 days. Opening Brief due: 120 days. | 08-10203 | |
05/05/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-11062 | |
06/06/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional Sanction of $500.00 due: 15 days or Transcript Request Form or motion due: 10 days. | 08-14396 | |
06/10/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 08-14716 | |
08/21/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-21591 | |
08/21/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. | 08-21592 | |
09/16/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-23827 | |
10/13/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-26314 | |
10/13/2008 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. | ||
02/03/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. | 09-02991 | |
02/03/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/19/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "We conclude that the district court order granting respondent's petition for judicial review should be affirmed." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | 09-04301 | |
03/17/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-05635 | |
03/17/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/01/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 19, 2009. | 09-05635 |