Case Information: 51469 | |||
Short Caption: | BETLACH VS. NEV. STATE BANK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A549579 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/29/2008 / Nitz, Dana | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/21/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Santoro, Driggs, Walch, Kearney, Holley & Thompson check no. 1524. | ||
04/21/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-09878 | |
04/29/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Dana Jonathon Nitz. | 08-10688 | |
05/05/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-11132 | |
05/06/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Dana Jonathon Nitz. (Docketing Statement) | 08-11268 | |
05/13/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -docketing statement served on settlement judge. | 08-11961 | |
06/27/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is not appropriate for mediation at this time and should be removed from the settlement conference program because there is a potential jurisdictional defect. | 08-16477 | |
07/03/2008 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. and Reinstating Briefing.This appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Transcript request due: 15 days. Opening brief due: 90 days. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-16928 | |
07/10/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation and Agreement to Dismiss Appeal. | 08-17598 | |
09/22/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- PANEL-TH | 08-24504 | |
09/22/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |