judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARPENTER VS. SHALEV

Case Information: 51470
Short Caption:CARPENTER VS. SHALEVCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A552427Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:04/25/2008 / Smith, JaySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/15/2010How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/21/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
04/21/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 08-09886
04/21/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days 08-09888
04/21/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days 08-09890
04/25/2008Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jay Earl Smith. 08-10326
05/08/2008Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Cuthbert E.A. Mack check no. 1388.
05/08/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. 08-11440
05/13/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 6/6/08. 08-11874
05/16/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. 08-12342
06/02/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-13833
06/18/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on June 2, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-15636
06/18/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-13834
06/24/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 7/23/08 08-16115
11/05/2008Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Final Settlement Report. 08-28324
11/17/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 11/17/08. Settlement Judge recommends this case remain in the program, within the time allowed by rule or the court, to accommodate parties and counsel. 08-29204
11/21/2008Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a tentative/provisional settlement of this matter. May take up to 60 days to complete. 08-29794
01/13/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Settlement Judge's recommendation that this appeal remain assigned to the settlement conference program is approved. Settlement Judge: 60 days to file Final Status Report. 09-00994
03/12/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. Supplemental Status Report. The parties have requested an additional 60 days to comply with their provisional settlement. 09-06332
03/16/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. (Supplemental) Settlement Judge recommendation - that the parties have requested an additional 60 days to comply with their provisional settlement. 09-06617
03/31/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 5/15/09. 09-08042
05/04/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 09-11024
05/08/2009Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. 09-11447
05/21/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Status of Appeal. 09-12666
05/29/2009Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/28/08. To Court Reporter: Cynthia Georgilas. 09-13452
08/07/2009BriefFiled Opening Brief. 09-19259
08/10/2009AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 09-19499
08/26/2009MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 5, 2009. 09-20758
08/26/2009Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/17/07. To Court Reporter: Jennifer Ramirez. (Submitted by respondent). 09-20768
08/31/2009TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Jessica Ramirez stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/17/07. 09-21191
10/06/2009BriefFiled Answering Brief. 09-24387
11/10/2009BriefFiled Reply Brief. 09-27426
06/15/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 10-15531
06/15/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/28/2010Order/DispositionalOrder of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." 10-24858
10/25/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-27730
10/25/2010Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/17/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 3, 2010. 10-27730