Case Information: 51465 | |||
Short Caption: | DOUGLAS CO. VS. MUNK | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 06CV00252 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Gibbons, Maupin | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/22/2008 / King, Patrick | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/21/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Gibbons. | ||
04/21/2008 | Filing Fee | Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 023735 returned to Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush & Eisinger. (No fee due - government agency.) | ||
04/21/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-09811 | |
04/21/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. (Thorndal, Armstrong, Delk, Balkenbush & Eisinger). | ||
04/22/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Patrick O. King. | 08-10010 | |
05/16/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 08-12339 | |
05/16/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 7/16/08. | 08-12360 | |
05/16/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-12399 | |
07/17/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 08-18398 | |
07/25/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. | 08-19288 | |
09/08/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. NRAP 42(b). CLK- PANEL-TH | 08-23040 | |
09/08/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |