Case Information: 51464 | |||
Short Caption: | RICRIZ, LLC VS. DIST. CT. (BARRIER) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A452269 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 09/30/2008 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/21/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Patti, Sgro & Lewis check no. 8635. | ||
04/21/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Petition for Writ of Mandamus or, in the Alternative, for Writ of Prohibition. | 08-09803 | |
07/11/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. real parties in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writs. | 08-17854 | |
09/30/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Submitting Writ Petition for Decision. | 08-25260 | |
09/30/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/05/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Granting Petition. for a Writ of Mandamus. "We grant the petition and direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus instructing the district court to vacate its August 27, 2007, order reinstating Eighth Judicial District Court Case No. A452269, to dismiss Case No. A452269, and to discharge the prejudgment writ of attachment entered on June 27, 2006." Fn1 [In light of this order, petitioners' alternative request for a writ of prohibition is denied." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. | 09-03181 | |
02/05/2009 | Writ | Issued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Mark C. Hafer for service upon Judge Elizabeth Goff Gonzalez. | 09-03195 | |
03/03/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 09-04627 | |
03/03/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/17/2009 | Writ | Filed Writ. Served on Judge Gonzalez. Affidavit attached states that the deputy court clerk refused to sign the receipt of copy, but that she would give a copy to the judge. Affidavit also states that the judge complied with the writ. | 09-03195 |