judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GREER VS. MOORE

Case Information: 55245
Short Caption:GREER VS. MOORECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0800206Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/14/2010 / Andrews, JonathanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/13/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 10-01019
01/13/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court.
01/14/2010Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jonanthan Andrews 10-01137
01/14/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Scapello & Huss. Check No. 29352.
02/02/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-02856
02/04/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 2/18/10 10-03149
02/22/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 10-04696
02/22/2010MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement 10-04697
02/26/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP-TH 10-05172
02/26/2010Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.