judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DUMAS VS. GUTHRIE-DUMAS

Case Information: 55244
Short Caption:DUMAS VS. GUTHRIE-DUMASCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 08DR1002901BClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:01/15/2010 / Wasick, DavidSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/12/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 10-00963
01/12/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court.
01/15/2010Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David Wasick 10-01341
01/15/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Robert A. Grayson - check no. 4664.
01/25/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 2/5/10 10-01844
01/27/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 3/29/10 10-02258
02/04/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-03185
02/04/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. 10-03186
02/10/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 10-03718
03/29/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 10-08124
03/29/2010MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement 10-08126
03/30/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- NNP-TH 10-08248
03/30/2010Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.