Case Information: 55218 | |||
Short Caption: | DRAEGER CONST. VS. QUASSANI | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A565134 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 01/12/2010 / Nitz, Dana | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/08/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-00571 | |
01/08/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | ||
01/12/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Dana Jonathon Nitz | 10-00889 | |
01/12/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Patti, Sgro & Lewis - Wells Fargo check no. 0885623094. | ||
01/25/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appopriate for mediation and a conference will be scheduled. | 10-01938 | |
01/26/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-02190 | |
02/25/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Association of New Law Firm (Marck C. Hafer, Esq.) | 10-05095 | |
03/02/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter | 10-05524 | |
03/09/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. Amended Status Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 10-06107 | |
03/11/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 30 days. | 10-06496 | |
03/30/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 10-08283 | |
03/31/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal "this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). CLK- NNP-TH | 10-08408 | |
03/31/2010 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |