Case: 05-22-00909-CV
05-22-00909-CV
09/15/2022
Contract
K&K Enterprises, LLC, Gary Kelley, Cheryl Kelley and Henry Kelley,
Preston Parker Crossing, Ltd.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/07/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
03/14/2023 | Sent to publisher | | |||||
01/26/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
01/26/2023 | Retention time case file will be retained | Destroy | | ||||
01/25/2023 | Submitted | | |||||
12/19/2022 | Response due | | |||||
12/07/2022 | Response due | | |||||
11/07/2022 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
10/24/2022 | Response due | | |||||
10/19/2022 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed |
| |||||
10/13/2022 | No reporters record filed in civil case |
| |||||
10/12/2022 | Order entered | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
10/11/2022 | Record due | | |||||
10/10/2022 | Extension of time to file clerks record filed | | |||||
09/15/2022 | Fee requested |
| |||||
09/15/2022 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
09/15/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
09/12/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
08/12/2022 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/26/2029 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
04/07/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
K&K Enterprises, LLC, et al. | Appellant | |
Kelley, Cheryl | Appellant | Cheryl Kelley |
Kelley, Gary | Appellant | Gary Kelley |
Preston Parker Crossing, Ltd. | Appellee | Michael G. Oddo |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 3
Collin
Honorable Lance S. Baxter
003-01239-2021
Claudia Webb