judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Claudia A. Brady v. Gregory A. Brady and One Network Enterprises, Inc.

Case: 02-23-00163-CV
02-23-00163-CV
05/10/2023
Arbitration
Claudia A. Brady
Gregory A. Brady and One Network Enterprises, Inc.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
01/02/2024Electronic reply brief filedAppellant
12/29/2023Corrected brief filedAppellant
12/11/2023Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
11/14/2023Electronic reply brief filedCross-Appellant
10/27/2023Electronic brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
10/27/2023Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedCross-Appellee
09/08/2023Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requestedCross-Appellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
02/15/2024Memorandum opinion issuedAffirmed in Part and Reversed & Rendered in Part
01/30/2024Submitted
01/19/2024Additional copies of documents received after initial filing
01/18/2024Additional copies of documents received after initial filing
01/02/2024Electronic reply brief filed
12/29/2023Corrected brief filed
12/29/2023Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied
12/20/2023Corrected brief requested
12/11/2023Case ready to be set
12/11/2023Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested
11/16/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/15/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/14/2023Electronic reply brief filed
10/27/2023Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested
10/27/2023Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested
10/25/2023Corrected brief requested
10/12/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/12/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/06/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/06/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/12/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/08/2023Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested
09/06/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/09/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/08/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/01/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/31/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/10/2023Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
06/12/2023Extension of time to file reporters record disposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/09/2023Extension of time to file reporters record filed
06/09/2023Electronic Clerks Record Filed
05/31/2023Fee paid
05/25/2023Docketing statement filed
05/25/2023Fee paid
05/17/2023Docketing statement filed
05/16/2023Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
05/10/2023Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/15/2024StatusRelease to publisher
04/25/2024StatusMandate to Issue
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
One Network Enterprises, Inc.AppelleeMichael S. Gardner
Jeremy R. Wilson
Alex Cleeter
Brady, Gregory A.AppelleeMichael S. Gardner
Jeremy D. Camp
Jeremy R. Wilson
Alex Cleeter
Brady, Claudia A.AppellantMarilea W. Lewis
Lisa Greenwood Duffee
Jodi L. Bender
Trial Court Information
233rd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Kenneth Newell
233-724980-22
Court Reporter, 233rd District Court