judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5696
A-5696
02/16/1956
Application for Writ of Error
JOHN L. MCMAHON, JR., ET AL.
JOHN J. CHRISTMAN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/06/1957Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/27/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
02/16/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/10/1957Dissenting opinion issued.
06/06/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/29/1957Concurring Opinion issued.
05/29/1957Opinion issued
07/18/1956Document received (See Remarks)
02/27/1956Response to Petition
02/16/1956Additional Copies received
02/16/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/16/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John J. Christman, et al.Respondent
John L. McMahon, Jr., et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information