Case Information: 55079 | |||
Short Caption: | ANGAUR, LLC VS. WELLS CARGO, INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A575497 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 12/22/2009 / Garcia-Mendoza, Eva | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/11/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-30136 | |
12/11/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
12/11/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 09-30138 | |
12/15/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Fennemore Craig, P.C. Check No. 2761. | ||
12/22/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Eva Garcia-Mendoza | 09-31054 | |
12/31/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Appellants' Docketing Statement Civil Appeals | 09-31645 | |
02/11/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 3/2/10 | 10-03760 | |
03/03/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter | 10-05657 | |
03/11/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 10-06509 | |
03/18/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Appellants, Angaur, LLC and Balaji Properties Investment. | 10-07239 | |
04/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. ". . . this appeal is dismissed." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-09281 | |
05/05/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-10007 | |
05/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/17/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 11, 2010. | 10-10007 |