Case Information: 55070 | |||
Short Caption: | WINFREY (LEONARD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34799 , 45023 , 45193 , 45882 , 52519 , 55971 , 74458 , 74463 , 74570 , 74570-COA , 75094 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C124806 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/30/2010 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/11/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 09-29996 | |
12/11/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/17/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. District Court Order due: 30 days. | 09-30632 | |
12/29/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 12/18/09. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order. | 09-31440 | |
01/04/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Transcript Request. Due Date: 10 days. | 10-00182 | |
01/12/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 10-00921 | |
01/14/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 10-01220 | |
01/28/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | 10-02512 | |
01/28/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-02513 | |
02/03/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. Second Amended Notice of Appeal. | 10-02941 | |
04/06/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-08876 | |
04/06/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion/stipulation to enlarge time to file opening brief is approved. Due date: April 16, 2010. | 10-08877 | |
04/19/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File Oversized Brief. | 10-10079 | |
04/19/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion for excess pages is approved. 34 pages granted. | 10-10080 | |
04/19/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-10081 | |
04/21/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief CD-ROM included. CD attached to Appendix. | 10-10346 | |
05/19/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-13099 | |
05/19/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion/stipulation to enlarge time to file answering brief is approved. Due date: June 18, 2010. | 10-13100 | |
06/16/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Second Motion for Extension of Time. (30) days. | 10-15612 | |
06/16/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Answering Brief due: July 19, 2010. | 10-15668 | |
07/19/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-18321 | |
07/19/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 10-18322 | |
08/26/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File the Reply Brief. | 10-22069 | |
08/30/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for extension of time. The clerk shall file the reply brief received via E-Flex on August 27, 2010. | 10-22197 | |
08/30/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief Reply Brief | 10-22199 | |
08/30/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/13/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 11-01357 | |
02/07/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-03804 | |
02/07/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/17/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 14, 2011. | 11-03804 |