judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ESCOTO VS. NEVADA BEVERAGE

Case Information: 55072
Short Caption:ESCOTO VS. NEVADA BEVERAGECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A585276 Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/21/2009 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/20/2010How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/11/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-30007
12/11/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
12/11/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days 09-30008
12/21/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan 09-30889
12/22/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Benson, Bertoldo, Baker & Carter, Chtd. - check no. 8703.
01/08/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 1/29/10 10-00700
01/13/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. 10-01021
01/19/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 1/29/10. 10-01481
02/01/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 10-02742
02/08/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 10-03552
02/08/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Motion for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement. 10-03553
02/16/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Motion for Extension of Time to File Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. 10-04101
02/19/2010Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. We grant appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received 2/2/2010. 10-04557
02/19/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-02804
03/01/2010Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 10-05316
03/09/2010Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. Amended Certificate of No Transcript Request. 10-06141
04/29/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief. 10-11080
04/29/2010AppendixFiled Joint Appendix with CD-ROM included. Vols. 1 through 2. 10-11084
05/28/2010BriefFiled Answering Brief. 10-13935
06/29/2010BriefFiled Reply Brief. 10-16935
07/20/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. 10-18617
07/20/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/28/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Reversal and Remand. "We reverse the district court order denying the petition for judicial review and instruct that this matter be remanded to the administrative appeals officer so that the appeals officer may set forth further findings and conclusions addressing the perceived shortcummings in Dr. Rimoldi's report set forth above." 11-12533
05/23/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 11-15028
05/23/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/06/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 31, 2011. 11-15028