judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5693
A-5693
02/16/1956
Application for Writ of Error
A. L. MERRIWETHER, ET AL.
LUBBOCK COTTON OIL COMPANY, CITY OF LUBBOCK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/04/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/07/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
02/27/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
02/16/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/09/1956Response to Motion filed
04/04/1956Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/07/1956Response to Petition
02/27/1956Response to Petition
02/16/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/16/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
A. L. Merriwether, et al.Petitioner
Lubbock Cotton Oil CompanyRespondent
City of LubbockRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information