Case Information: 55074 | |||
Short Caption: | YALE ENTERPRISES, INC. VS. NAPOLI | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A533826 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 12/23/2009 / Shirinian, Ara | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/11/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-30115 | |
12/11/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. FILING FEE MAILED SEPARATELY. | ||
12/16/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from McCullough, Perez & Associates, Ltd. Check No. 8266. | ||
12/17/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. DOCKETING STATEMENT CIVIL APPEALS | 09-30692 | |
12/23/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian | 09-31076 | |
01/11/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 2/23/10 | 10-00802 | |
04/16/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 10-10050 | |
04/21/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 10-10430 | |
04/22/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Counsel for Appellant Christopher R. McCullough. | 10-10457 | |
04/28/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 10-10862 | |
05/28/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion to Withdaw as Counsel. The clerk of this court shall remove McCulllough, Perez and Associates, Ltd., as appellant's counsel in this appeal. Appellant shall have 40 days from the date of this order to retain new counsel and to cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court. Briefing is suspended. | 10-13884 | |
08/25/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Rena McDonald of McDonald Law Group as counsel for appellant. | 10-21752 | |
01/25/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Counsel for Appellant Rena M. McDonald. | 11-02415 | |
02/11/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. The clerk of this court shall remove the McDonald Law Group, LLC, as appellant's counsel in this appeal. Appellant: 40 days to retain new counsel. Briefing remains suspended. | 11-04593 | |
03/04/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. (Respondent). | 11-06741 | |
04/04/2011 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter from Charles M. Damus requesting the appeal be dismissed with prejudice and attorney's fees be awarded to respondent Napoli. | 11-10000 | |
05/09/2011 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter from Charles M. Damus requesting the appeal be dismissed with prejudice and that attorney's fees be awarded to respondent Napoli. | 11-13687 | |
07/07/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[On April 4 and May 9, 2011, respondent's counsel improperly filed letters in this court seeking to dismiss this appeal. No action need be taken with respect to those letters.] | 11-20273 | |
08/01/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-23068 | |
08/01/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/11/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 8, 2011. | 11-23068 |