Case: 03-24-00074-CV
03-24-00074-CV
01/29/2024
Miscellaneous/other civil
Trivista Operating LLC and Trivista Oil Company LLC
ERC Acquisitions II LLC
No
www.txcourts.gov/3rdcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/15/2024 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed on Appellant's Motion |
| ||||||
02/15/2024 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
02/14/2024 | Submitted | | |||||||
02/06/2024 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||||
01/29/2024 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/08/2024 | Status | Fee due in this court |
03/01/2024 | Status | Motion for rehearing enbanc due |
03/01/2024 | Status | Motion for rehearing due |
04/26/2024 | Status | Mandate to Issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Trivista Oil Company LLC | Appellant | Mr. Christopher C. Rosas |
ERC Acquisitions II LLC | Appellee | Mr. Michael C. Sanders Ms. Lina Reyes-Burns |
Trivista Operating LLC | Appellant | Mr. Christopher C. Rosas |
Trial Court Information
155th District Court
Fayette
Honorable Jeff R. Steinhauser
2023V-268
Nancy Lozano