Case Information: 55075 | |||
Short Caption: | CASTELLANOS (SANDRA) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C257879 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/14/2010 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/11/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-30114 | |
12/11/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/23/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. | 09-31091 | |
01/13/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 10-01000 | |
01/13/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 10-01001 | |
01/14/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 10-01219 | |
01/14/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/03/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG fn1[We have considered the documents in this matter, and we conclude that no relief is warranted for the reason set forth above.] | 10-02958 | |
02/23/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. | 10-04803 | |
02/23/2010 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 2/3/10 addressed to Sandra M. Castellanos. Address has been updated per NDOC. Order remailed to new address. | 10-04803 | |
03/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-04346 | |
03/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/03/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 5, 2010. | 10-04346 |