Case Information: 55078 | |||
Short Caption: | SMITH (ROBERT) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 32283 , 38216 , 49703 , 51078 , 74617 , 74617-COA , 82411 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C128262 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Douglas | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 09/13/2010 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/11/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 09-30122 | |
12/11/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/11/2009 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
12/28/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/23/09, 7/30/09. To Court Reporters: K. Esparza, D. Winn. | 09-31285 | |
12/28/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-31286 | |
01/19/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 6/23/09, 7/30/09. | 10-01523 | |
03/29/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. | 10-08167 | |
03/29/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: May 12, 2010. | 10-08168 | |
05/13/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-12412 | |
05/13/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 1 | 10-12413 | |
05/13/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 2 | 10-12414 | |
05/13/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 3 | 10-12415 | |
05/13/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume 6 | 10-12427 | |
05/20/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief CD-ROM included. Volumes 4, 5 and Supplemental. | 10-13131 | |
06/14/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30) days. | 10-15375 | |
06/14/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due date: July 14, 2010. | 10-15379 | |
07/14/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-18056 | |
07/14/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Volume 1. | 10-18057 | |
07/14/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Volume 2. | 10-18058 | |
07/14/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Volume 3. | 10-18059 | |
07/14/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Volume 4. | 10-18060 | |
07/14/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Volume 5. | 10-18061 | |
07/14/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Volume 6. | 10-18063 | |
08/05/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. | 10-20220 | |
08/05/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion/stipulation to enlarge time to file reply brief is approved. Due date: September 13, 2010. | 10-20221 | |
09/13/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 10-23528 | |
09/13/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 10-32247 | |
01/04/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-00265 | |
01/04/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/21/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 11, 2011. | 11-00265 |