judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ESTATE OF ELSIE M. JEDRZEJEWSKI, by and through the Personal Representative, DAVID G. SEVERN v. JANET L. BIERMA

Case Heading (S-07-0268)
Case Number:S-07-0268Case Docketed On:11/20/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:ESTATE OF ELSIE M. JEDRZEJEWSKI, by and through the Personal Representative, DAVID G. SEVERN v. JANET L. BIERMA
Full Title:ESTATE OF ELSIE M. JEDRZEJEWSKI, by and through the Personal Representative, DAVID G. SEVERN, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. JANET L. BIERMA, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantELSIE M. JEDRZEJEWSKISusan L. Feinman
Laura Jean Jackson
AppelleeJanet L. BiermaAlexander K. Davison
William D. Bagley

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Other, Property - Real
Opinion Number:2008 WY 151
Citation:197 P.3d 1254

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/20/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/20/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
11/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/03/2008Event - Phone Call from Alex Davison re service of pleadings. Mr. Davison filed his entry of appearance in District Court prior to docketing, but was not served with NOA or docketing letter. Sent copy; he will remind counsel for appellantEventPhone CallFinal
01/07/2008Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
02/21/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/25/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
03/10/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
03/11/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
03/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/20/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcript; Volume III, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/18/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Golden writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/05/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/05/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/19/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card never returned. Called the District Court Clerk's office and confirmed they checked the record back in on January 6, 2009 at 2:08 p.m.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal