judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHERRY ALLEN, ET AL V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ET AL

Case Information: 10-DA-0017
Short Caption:SHERRY ALLEN, ET AL V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ET ALClassification:Discretionary - Discretionary - Other Discretionary Applicatn
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAM7229-08Filed Date:09/01/2010

Opening Event Date:09/01/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerSherry Allen N
David E. HaynesNY
Stephen D. AnnandNN
PetitionerWayne Allen N
David E. HaynesNY
Stephen D. AnnandNN
PetitionerEstate of Eric AllenN
David E. HaynesNY
Stephen D. AnnandNN
RespondentDistrict of ColumbiaN
Donna M. MuraskyNY
Todd S. KimNY
Carl J. SchifferleNY
RespondentApple Healthcare Medical Group PcN
Cynthia Vancil SantoniNN
RespondentDoctors Community Health Care/envision Hosp. Corp.N
Cynthia Vancil SantoniNN
RespondentGreater Southeast Community HospitalN
Cynthia Vancil SantoniNN
RespondentRoosevelt Brandly N
Cynthia Vancil SantoniNN
RespondentZeleke Desse Kassahun N
Cynthia Vancil SantoniNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/01/2010APPLICATION FOR ALLOWANCE OF APPEAL (RECVD ONLY) (Titled as: Application for Permission to Appeal) Denied
09/02/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
09/03/2010TMC - application for allowance of appeal - oppo - notice of pending settlement
09/09/2010APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to aplt's application for permission to appeal 14 days no opp
09/13/2010 ORDERED that the DISTRICT'S MOTION IS GRANTED and its response, if any, to the applicant's AAA shall be filed NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 27, 2010. (BY: JAC) lw
09/27/2010RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION- to aplicants application for permission to appeal
09/28/2010NOTICE RECEIVED - from the petitioners of pending partial settlement of underlying claims against hospital defendants
09/30/2010 On cosideration of the AAA, the opposition thereto and the notice of the pending partial settlement of underlying claims against the hospital defendants, it is ORDERED that the AAA IS DENIED as the APPLICATION does not meet the statutory requirements. See DC Code 11-721 (d)(2001). (FITHNW) (cb)