judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CRIMMINS VS. AMERICAN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE

Case Information: 36292
Short Caption:CRIMMINS VS. AMERICAN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 42667
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9702134Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/23/2000 / Jenkins, NathanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:12/10/2001 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:12/10/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/15/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Leverty & Associates Law Chartered--check no. 05872.
06/15/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10246
06/23/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Nathan M. Jenkins. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/14/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. 00-12223
07/19/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Judgment filed June 23, 2000, and Notice of Entry of June 23, 2000, Order. Due Date: 10 days
07/21/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter.
07/25/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Denying Motion to Alter/Amend or Reconsideration filed in district court on June 23, 2000. 00-12861
07/25/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order. Filed in district court on: June 28, 2000. 00-12863
09/08/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-15857
09/08/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
09/20/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Upon the filing of the docketing statement, this court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-16576
09/25/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-16927
09/25/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-16928
01/17/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: February 20, 2001. 01-01064
01/23/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. American National Life Insurance Company of Texas and American National Insurance Company, hereby substitute and appoint the law firm of Allison, MacKenzie, Hartman, Soumbeniotis & Russell, Ltd., as their attorneys of record in place and stead of the law firm of Laxalt & Normura, Ltd. 01-01470
01/24/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Substitution of Attorneys). 01-01649
02/07/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. --Amended Affidavit of Mailing. 01-02512
02/20/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 2/20/01. 01-03201
02/20/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 4. 01-03202
02/22/2001BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Brief of Amicus Curiae State of Nevada, Department of Business and Industry, Divison of Insurance in Support of Appellants John and Cathy Crimmins. 01-03421
03/09/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: 4/23/01. 01-04339
04/23/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 04/23/01. 01-06894
05/21/2001MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: June 22, 2001. 01-08485
06/22/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 06/22/01. 01-10612
06/22/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Reply Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix to Appellants' Reply Brief. 01-10614
08/08/2001BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. 01-13405
08/14/2001BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Response to Supplemental Authorities. 01-13811
10/30/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on December 10, 2001, at 9:00 a.m. in Carson City. (NNP02-MS/RR/NB)
11/26/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
12/10/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP02-MS/RR/NB.
03/08/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Reversal and Remand. "REVERSE and REMAND for trial." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-04175
04/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-04287
04/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/15/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 5, 2002. 02-04287