Case Information: 55082 | |||
Short Caption: | HANTGES VS. WISE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 41928 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D285168 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/14/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
12/14/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-30175 | |
12/14/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 09-30176 | |
12/22/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Thomas A. Hantges - check no. 113. | ||
12/31/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 09-31642 | |
01/14/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 10-01258 | |
01/19/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 10-01428 | |
01/25/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 10-02022 | |
01/25/2010 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 3/25/09. Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services (Submitted by T. Hantges) | 10-02025 | |
01/27/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 10-02285 | |
02/05/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Tammy Gonzales stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/6/09. | 10-03371 | |
03/10/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion to Dismiss, Directing Transmission of Record, and Directing Response. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Respondent's Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement (10 pages) due: 60 days. | 10-06172 | |
04/07/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 38. | 10-08933 | |
05/11/2010 | Brief | Filed Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Response to Appellant's Case Appeal Statement. | 10-12208 | |
09/14/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 10-23553 | |
10/11/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-26475 | |
10/11/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/03/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 20, 2010. | 10-26475 |