judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5748
A-5748
02/29/1956
Application for Writ of Error
MALCOLM NOMACK, ET AL.
ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/20/1956Response to Brief filedPetitioner
12/15/1956Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
12/05/1956Motion for RehearingRespondent
04/12/1956Reply to ResponsePetitioner
03/28/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
02/29/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/20/1956Response to Brief filed
12/15/1956Brief in Support of Petition
12/10/1956Response to Motion filed
12/05/1956Motion for Rehearing
11/21/1956Opinion issued
06/27/1956Document received (See Remarks)
04/12/1956Reply to Response
03/28/1956Response to Petition
03/23/1956Document received (See Remarks)
02/29/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Allstate Insurance CompanyRespondent
Malcolm Nomack, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information