judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5724
A-5724
03/07/1956
Application for Writ of Error
R. L. THORNTON
H. E. RAINS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/27/1957Supplement to Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/21/1957Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/07/1956Supplement to Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/25/1956Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/22/1956Brief on the MeritsRespondent
05/07/1956Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
03/17/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
03/07/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/10/1957Letter Filed
03/28/1957Letter Filed
03/27/1957Order from Lower Court filed
02/27/1957Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
02/21/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/06/1957New majority opinion substituted for prior opinion
02/06/1957Opinion issued
12/07/1956Supplement to Motion for Rehearing
09/29/1956Response to Motion filed
07/25/1956Additional Copies received
07/25/1956Motion for Rehearing
07/11/1956Dissenting opinion issued.
07/11/1956Previous opinion withdrawn
05/22/1956Brief on the Merits
05/07/1956Brief on the Merits
04/11/1956Document received (See Remarks)
03/17/1956Response to Petition
03/07/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/07/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
R. L. ThorntonPetitioner
H. E. Rains, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information