Case: 02-23-00205-CR
02-23-00205-CR
08/04/2023
Assault
Gary Dion Daniels
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/04/2024 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested | State |
| ||||
01/02/2024 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/04/2024 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
03/04/2024 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
01/26/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
01/26/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
01/02/2024 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
12/07/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
12/04/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
11/06/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
11/03/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
11/02/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
11/01/2023 | Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
10/03/2023 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
10/02/2023 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
09/01/2023 | Trial court certification filed | | |||||
08/31/2023 | Letter received |
| |||||
08/04/2023 | Notice to trial court that certification is missing |
| |||||
08/04/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/04/2024 | At Issue | At issue |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Steven W. Conder Abigail E. Davis |
Daniels, Gary Dion | Criminal - Appellant | Sarah Durham |
Trial Court Information
432nd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Ruben Gonzalez
1690471
Court Reporter, 432nd District Court
40 Yrs TDCJ