Case: 07-23-00294-CV
07-23-00294-CV
06/29/2023
Miscellaneous/other civil
Chris Samples, Individually and General Manger of Chris Samples Broadcasting, Inc., d/b/a KXDJ Radio Station, Chris Samples Broadcasting, Inc. d/b/a KXDJ Radio Station, Richard Biggs, Michael Crain, DOT Comply, Inc., d/b/a USA Investigations, Anita Webb, Laurie Ezzell Brown, Individually and as Former Owner and Editor of the Canadian Record, The Canadian Record, Amanda Donna kay Lehman and Elizabeth Michelle Gomez
Estate of Thomas Brown, Through its Authorized Representative, Penny Meek, Penny Meek Individually, Chris Meek, and Tucker Brown
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/25/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
08/25/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissal |
| ||||||
08/25/2023 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||||
08/24/2023 | Submitted | | |||||||
08/22/2023 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||||
08/21/2023 | Corrected motion requested | | |||||||
08/21/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | Motion Granted | | ||||||
08/21/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||||
08/17/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||||
08/11/2023 | Motion to access appellate record disp | Motion Granted | | ||||||
08/11/2023 | Motion to access appellate record filed | | |||||||
08/11/2023 | Supplemental clerks record filed | | |||||||
08/10/2023 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||||
08/09/2023 | Response filed | | |||||||
08/08/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||||
08/07/2023 | Clerks record filed | | |||||||
08/07/2023 | Clerks record filed | | |||||||
08/07/2023 | Notice of late record | | |||||||
07/31/2023 | Extension of time to file clerks record filed | | |||||||
07/24/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
07/21/2023 | Corrected document requested | | |||||||
07/20/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
07/20/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
07/20/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
07/20/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||||
07/19/2023 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||||
07/14/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||||
07/14/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||||
07/14/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||||
07/13/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
07/13/2023 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||||
07/10/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed | | |||||||
07/10/2023 | Fee paid | | |||||||
07/10/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||||
07/10/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||||
07/10/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||||
07/07/2023 | Extension of time to file clerks record filed | | |||||||
07/07/2023 | Fee requested | | |||||||
07/06/2023 | Docketing statement requested | | |||||||
07/06/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||||
07/05/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||||
07/05/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||||
07/05/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||||
07/05/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||||
06/29/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | | |||||||
06/28/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
06/08/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/25/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Webb, Anita | Real party in interest | Courtney D. Miller John H. Lovell |
Laurie Ezzell Brown, Individually and as Former Owner and Editor of The Canadian Record | Real party in interest | Don R. Richards |
Biggs, Richard | Appellant | Richard Biggs Alysia Cordova |
Chris Samples, Individually and General Manager of Chris Samples Broadcasting, Inc. d/b/a KXDJ Radio Station | Appellant | Marcy M. Erwin Robert L. Craig, Jr. |
Gomez, Elizabeth Michelle | Real party in interest | Elizabeth Michelle Gomez |
DOT Comply, Inc., d/b/a USA Investigations | Appellant | Richard Biggs |
Estate of Thomas Brown, through its Authorized Representative, Penny Meek, Penny Meek Individually, Chris Meek and Tucker Brown | Appellee | John S. Morgan |
Chris Samples Broadcasting, Inc. d/b/a KXDJ Radio Station | Appellant | Robert Parke Latham Robert L. Craig, Jr. Michael Murtha Marcy M. Erwin |
Lehman, Amanda Donna kay | Real party in interest | David Black |
The Canadian Record | Real party in interest | Don R. Richards |
Crain, Michael | Appellant | Richard Biggs |
Trial Court Information
99th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable J. Phillip Hays
DC-2023-CV-0237
Isabel Villa