judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5763
A-5763
03/06/1956
Application for Writ of Error
JOHN HANKINS
AMERICAN NATIONAL BANK OF AMARILLO, FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF PANHANDLE, FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF PANHANDLE, AND AMERICAN NATIONAL BANK OF AMARILLO
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/30/1956Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/07/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
03/30/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
03/06/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/30/1956Motion for Rehearing
04/07/1956Response to Petition
03/30/1956Response to Petition
03/26/1956Document received (See Remarks)
03/06/1956Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John HankinsPetitioner
First National Bank of Panhandle, and American National Bank of AmarilloRespondent
American National Bank of AmarilloRespondent
First National Bank of PanhandleRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information