Case: 04-23-00644-CV
04-23-00644-CV
06/30/2023
Interlocutory
Kendall County, et al
Waring Land Investments, LLC
No
13th Court of Appeals
07/31/2023
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/31/2023 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Grant motion |
| ||||
07/27/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion Granted in Part |
| ||||
07/26/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
07/18/2023 | Appearance of counsel |
| |||||
07/17/2023 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
07/12/2023 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
07/12/2023 | Amended notice of appeal filed |
| |||||
07/12/2023 | Fee paid |
| |||||
07/10/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
06/30/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
06/30/2023 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||
06/29/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
06/22/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/30/2023 | Status | Pending action of court |
07/31/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
08/28/2023 | Status | Appellant brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Chapman , Richard | Appellant | George E. Hyde Matthew L. Weston Stephen Speck |
Waring Land Investments, LLC | Appellee | Corey F. Wehmeyer Renee Yanta Robert Whitmer |
Carpenter , Chad | Appellant | Matthew L. Weston George E. Hyde Stephen Speck |
Schulle , Mary Ellen | Appellant | Stephen Speck George E. Hyde Matthew L. Weston |
Wisian , Andra M. | Appellant | Matthew L. Weston Stephen Speck George E. Hyde |
Stolarczyk , Shane | Appellant | Matthew L. Weston Stephen Speck George E. Hyde |
Bergmann, Christina | Appellant | Matthew L. Weston Stephen Speck George E. Hyde |
Tobolka, I, Richard J. | Appellant | Stephen Speck George E. Hyde Matthew L. Weston |
Kendall County | Appellant | Stephen Speck George E. Hyde Matthew L. Weston |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law
Kendall
Honorable Sid L. Harle
23-063
Kelly Grossman