Case: 05-24-00085-CV
05-24-00085-CV
01/29/2024
Miscellaneous/other civil
Micah Stephene Boyle
Ellen Boyle Duncan, Charles A. Duncan and Pat Boyle
No
4th Court of Appeals
01/29/2024
04-24-00015-CV
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/2024 | Record due | | |||||
02/27/2024 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
01/29/2024 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals |
| |||||
01/26/2024 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
01/19/2024 | Docketing statement filed |
| |||||
01/17/2024 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
01/12/2024 | Notice of appeal received |
| |||||
01/11/2024 | Internal memo | | |||||
01/08/2024 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
01/08/2024 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | | |||||
01/08/2024 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
01/08/2024 | Case began in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/28/2024 | Status | Appellant brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Boyle Duncan , Ellen | Appellee | Diana M. Geis Herbert S. Hill |
Boyle , Micah Stephen | Appellant | Arthur J. Rossi, Jr. John A. Mead |
Duncan , Charles A. | Appellee | |
Boyle , Pat | Appellee |
Trial Court Information
57th District Court
Bexar
Honorable Angelica Jimenez
2020CI02365
Judy Stewart