Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/11/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | | |
12/11/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | | 09-30058 |
12/11/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | | 09-30061 |
01/06/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | | 10-00322 |
01/21/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | | 10-01718 |
01/21/2010 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Letter Regarding Caption. | | 10-01719 |
02/08/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/15/07, 7/15/08, 8/19/08, 4/28/09, and 8/26/09. | | 10-03565 |
02/11/2010 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. -Proof of Service for Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | | 10-03832 |
02/11/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 10/15/07, 7/15/08, 8/19/08, 4/28/09, and 8/26/09. (Submitted by Sebastian Martinez). | | 10-03833 |
02/11/2010 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 10/15/07, 7/15/08, 8/19/08, 4/28/09, and 8/26/09. Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. (Marked SEALED and submitted by Sebastian Martinez). | | 10-03835 |
03/19/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Apellant to Pay Filing Fee or Comply with Nrap 24(A) and Directing Appellant to Properly Serve the Notice of Appeal. Filing Fee due: 30 days. Appellant's Proof of Service due: 30 days. | | 10-07396 |
03/30/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Copy of order filed in district court on December 8, 2009. Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. | | 10-08270 |
03/30/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Receipt of Copy- Notice of Appeal. | | 10-08271 |
03/30/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Receipt of Copy- Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | | 10-08274 |
06/04/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Record. Due: 30 days. | | 10-14440 |
06/15/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 5. (SEALED). | | 10-15483 |
06/15/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
07/21/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing respondent Kristi Rae Fredianelli: Robert Eisenberg (Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg). | | 10-18776 |
08/10/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Amended Caption. We direct the clerk of this court to amend the caption to conform to this order. The parties shall have 10 days to file any objection. | | 10-20615 |
08/27/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Response. Date Due: 30 days. (Each respondent). | | 10-22082 |
09/27/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time for Response to Proper Person Statement. | | 10-24735 |
10/07/2010 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Opposition to Motion for Extension of Time for Response to Proper Person Statement and Countermotion for Sanctions for Delay; and Request for Appointment of Pro Bono Attorney for Appellant. | | 10-26201 |
10/15/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for an Extension of Time, Denying Countermotion for Appointment of Counsel and Sanctions, and Directing Compliance with this Court's August 27, 2010, Order. We direct the clerk of this court to file Ms. Fredianelli's response, provisionally received on October 12, 2010. Mr. Fredianelli and respondent Flannery responses due: 10/22/10. | | 10-27002 |
10/15/2010 | Brief | Filed Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. (Respondents Kristi Rae Fredianelli and Anthony Fredianelli.) | | 10-27003 |
10/19/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Second Notice of Association of Counsel. Representing respondent Anthony Fredianelli: Robert L. Eisenberg/Lemons, Grundy & Eisenberg. | | 10-27225 |
10/19/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Order of October 15, 2010. (Respondents Kristi and Anthony Fredianelli.) | | 10-27242 |
11/10/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Reply to Response to Proper Person Statement. | | 10-29539 |
01/18/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." | | 11-01645 |
02/14/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 11-04725 |
02/14/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
02/24/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on February 18, 2011. | | 11-04725 |