Case: 02-22-00274-CR
02-22-00274-CR
11/10/2022
Aggravated Assault
Rodney Glenn Sheppard, Jr.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/29/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||
01/12/2023 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
01/12/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||
01/11/2023 | Submitted | | |||||
01/11/2023 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||
01/06/2023 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
01/03/2023 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
12/13/2022 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||
11/10/2022 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/29/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Sheppard, Junior, Rodney Glenn | Criminal - Appellant | Carey Jensen |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Bryce Perry |
Trial Court Information
78th District Court
Wichita
Honorable Meredith Kennedy
61,547-B
Court Reporter, 78th District Court
15 Yrs. IDTDCJ