Case: 22-0816
22-0816
09/16/2022
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
IN RE DEIRDRE GILBERT
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/21/2022 | Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Relator | PENDING | Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Deirdre Gilbert. | |||||
09/16/2022 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Relator | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Deirdre Gilbert. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/04/2022 | Case Stored | e-stored | | |||||
09/30/2022 | Motion to Amend disposed | Filing granted | Motion to Amend Petition for Writ of Mandamus is granted. | | ||||
09/30/2022 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Denied | Motion for Injunction is denied. | | ||||
09/30/2022 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
09/22/2022 | Response to Motion filed | Response to Motion to Amend Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of John B. Scott, et al. | ||||||
09/21/2022 | Motion to Amend Filed | Motion to Amend Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Deirdre Gilbert. | ||||||
09/21/2022 | Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | PENDING | Amended Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Deirdre Gilbert. | ||||||
09/20/2022 | Letter Filed | Letter filed on behalf of Deirde Gilbert. | ||||||
09/19/2022 | Electronic communication sent to Party | Email sent to counsel for Real Party in Interest regarding Motion filed. | | |||||
09/18/2022 | Miscellaneous Motion | Motion for Injunction filed on behalf of Deirdre Gilbert. | ||||||
09/16/2022 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed | Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed on behalf of Deirdre Gilbert. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
11/04/2022 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
John B. Scott, Texas Secretary of State | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Leif A. Olson Mr. Patrick K. Sweeten |
The Court of Appeals for the Third District of Texas, Austin | Respondent | |
Gilbert, Deirdre | Relator | Ms. Deirdre Gilbert |
The State of Texas | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Leif A. Olson Mr. Patrick K. Sweeten |
Keith Ingram, Director of Elections | Real Party in Interest | Mr. Patrick K. Sweeten Mr. Leif A. Olson |
Court of Appeals Information:
03-22-00554-CV
"Denied"
___ SW3d ___, 09-20-22
3rd Court of Appeals
Honorable Edward Stuart Smith
Trial Court Information
353rd District Court
Travis
Honorable Amy Clark-Meachum
D-1-GN-22-003087