Case Information: 53572 | |||
Short Caption: | VELLA (RICHARD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 54561 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C243174 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/09/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-08956 | |
04/09/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/22/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-10021 | |
05/19/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-11561 | |
05/19/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/28/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 22, 2009. | 09-11561 |