judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH (WILLIE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 53573
Short Caption:SMITH (WILLIE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43097 , 44333 , 45040 , 46082 , 47846 , 50551 , 51627 , 54096 , 58880 , 67819 , 67819-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C197707 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/09/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 09-08961
04/09/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/23/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. 09-10099
05/19/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-11568
05/19/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/28/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 22, 2009. 09-11568