Case Information: 51594 | |||
Short Caption: | MORGAN VS. SAVAGE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0600062 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/16/2009 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/09/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Richard G. Hill, Chartered check no. 2527. | ||
05/09/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 08-11696 | |
06/09/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. | 08-14449 | |
06/20/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-15891 | |
06/20/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Certification regarding Transcript. | 08-15892 | |
09/08/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-23100 | |
09/08/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 08-23102 | |
10/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. to file a proper person brief. Respondent shall have until 11/7/08 to file and serve the answering brief. | 08-27249 | |
10/30/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant: 15 days to show cause. The preparation of transcripts and the briefing schedule in this appeal is suspended pending further order of this court. Respondent may file any reply within 10 days from the date of that appellant's response is served. | 08-27899 | |
11/10/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 08-28711 | |
11/25/2008 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause. | 08-30116 | |
12/31/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. we conclude that it appears that this court has jurisdiction over this appeal and thus we reinstate the briefing schedule. Respondent shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall have ten days from service of respondent's answering brief to file and serve the reply brief, if deemed necessary. | 08-33094 | |
02/02/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 09-02880 | |
02/02/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 09-02881 | |
02/04/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: March 11, 2009. | 09-03039 | |
03/05/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 09-05621 | |
03/16/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for on the record and briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. | 09-06667 | |
03/16/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/24/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. | 09-28704 | |
12/11/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Memorandum Of Costs and Disbursements. | 09-30109 | |
12/22/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: $130.33. | 09-30979 | |
12/22/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements allowed and taxed in the amount of $130.33. | 09-29889 | |
12/22/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/31/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 24, 2009. | 09-29889 |