Case Information: 53574 | |||
Short Caption: | REBERGER (LANCE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 50632 , 53580 , 53807 , 58928 , 59179 , 59641 , 60210 , 60461 , 60963 , 61460 , 68522 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C098213 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/09/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-08963 | |
04/09/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/21/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-09983 | |
06/04/2009 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 09-14072 | |
06/30/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-15213 | |
06/30/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/13/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 1, 2009. | 09-15213 |