Case Information: 51622 | |||
Short Caption: | VOLPICELLI (FERRILL) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 43203 , 61142 , 63554 , 65212 , 70126 , 70126-COA , 70646 , 70646-COA , 81337 , 82369 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR031263 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/09/2009 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/14/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/14/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-12126 | |
06/03/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. of Limited Remand for Designation of Counsel. District court: 30 days to appoint counsel for appellant. Within 5 days from the appointment or appearance of counsel, the district court clerk shall transmit to the clerk of this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order appointing appellate counsel. | 08-13941 | |
06/11/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 6/9/08. Order Appointing Counsel. | 08-14828 | |
06/11/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days | 08-14842 | |
06/26/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-16404 | |
06/26/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 2/14/08. To Court Reporter: Judith Ann Schonlau. | 08-16405 | |
08/13/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Judith Ann Schonlau to file certificate of delivery of transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | 08-20859 | |
08/20/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Terry Jenkins stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/14/08. | 08-21472 | |
10/09/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: 11/10/08. | 08-26024 | |
11/10/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-28623 | |
11/10/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 2. | 08-28627 | |
12/11/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-31584 | |
01/09/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: February 9, 2009. | 09-00689 | |
02/09/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 09-03491 | |
02/09/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
03/02/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to File Amended Reply Brief. | 09-05274 | |
03/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. This court grants the motion and directs the clerk of this court to file the amended reply brief. | 09-05758 | |
03/06/2009 | Brief | Filed Amended Brief. Reply brief. | 09-05761 | |
09/08/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to file Supplemental Appendix. Due: 10 days. | 09-21668 | |
09/15/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Supplemental Appendix. | 09-22399 | |
12/03/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG | 09-29296 | |
12/29/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-30324 | |
12/29/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/06/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. to Recall Remittitur. | 10-00336 | |
01/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 30, 2009. | 09-30324 | |
01/22/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion to Recall Remittitur and Denying Permission for a Late Petition for Rehearing. | 10-01893 |