Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/12/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Kelleher & Kelleher, LLC check no. 6893. | | |
05/12/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | | 08-11846 |
05/16/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan | | 08-12392 |
05/23/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. From John Kelleher. | | 08-13026 |
05/23/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Mario D. Valencia and Beau Sterling. (Docketing Statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | | 08-13027 |
05/29/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 7/1/08. | | 08-13486 |
06/02/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 08-13815 |
06/10/2008 | Docketing Statement | Received Response to Docketing Statement. FILED PER ORDER OF 6/16/08. | | 08-14640 |
06/16/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for extension to file the docketing statement. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received on June 6, 2008 and the response to the docketing statement received on June 10, 2008. | | 08-15330 |
06/16/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. FILED PER ORDER OF 6/16/08. | | 08-14350 |
06/16/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. | | 08-33130 |
07/07/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 8/13/08 | | 08-17155 |
08/18/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Parties request continuance to a date pending between 9/3/08 and 9/5/08. | | 08-21253 |
08/21/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 9/10/08 | | 08-21533 |
08/27/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 9/18/08 | | 08-22052 |
09/24/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 10/2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | | 08-24622 |
10/06/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 08-25749 |
10/13/2008 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix.
[Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | | 08-26352 |
10/30/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/06/08. To Court Reporter: Norma Ramirez. | | 08-27924 |
12/02/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. To Prepare and File Transcript. Court Recorder Norma Ramirez. | | 08-30568 |
12/18/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Norma Ramirez stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/6/08. | | 08-32141 |
12/30/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Counsel for appellant shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellant's response is served. | | 08-32955 |
01/20/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Mary Kulic's Response to Order to Show Cause. | | 09-01490 |
01/21/2009 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. Granting Motion. Court recorder Norma Ramirez has filed a motion for an extension of time to file the transcript requested of her. Cause appearing, the motion is granted. fn1[On December 18, 2008, Ms. Ramirez filed a certificate indicating that the requested transcript was delivered to appellant's counsel on December 17, 2008.] | | 09-01614 |
02/19/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Marcy Kulic's Amended Response to Order to Show Cause. | | 09-04323 |
02/23/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Amended/Supplemental. | | 09-04696 |
03/27/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Briefing Reinstated. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 30 days. | | 09-07718 |
04/29/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: May 27, 2009. | | 09-10619 |
06/01/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | | 09-13594 |
06/08/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Motion to Dismiss Appeal as to Clark County Trustee Services Only. | | 09-14280 |
06/08/2009 | Brief | Received Opening Brief. FILED PER ORDER OF 7/10/09. | | 09-14320 |
06/08/2009 | Appendix | Received Appendix. FILED PER ORDER OF 7/10/09. | | 09-14321 |
07/10/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Dismissing Appeal in Part and Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. Clark County Trustee Services is hereby dismissed. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and appendix, provisionally received in this court on June 8, 2009. | | 09-17049 |
07/10/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | | 09-14320 |
07/10/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | | 09-14321 |
07/10/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 09-17011 |
08/12/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: 9/9/09. | | 09-19639 |
09/10/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 09-21899 |
02/01/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP | | 10-02705 |
02/22/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Marcy Kulic's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Petition for Rehearing. (18) days. | | 10-04631 |
03/10/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Received Petition for Rehearing. Via E-flex. | | |
03/11/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. We grant the motion. The clerk shall file appellant's petition for rehearing, provisionally received in this court on March 10, 2010. | | 10-06522 |
03/11/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Petition for Rehearing | | 10-06525 |
03/11/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. E-Payment $150 from Beau Sterling | | |
04/30/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | | 10-11115 |
05/07/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Marcy Kulic's Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. (10) days. | | 10-11982 |
05/21/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Received Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Via E-Flex. FILED PER ORDER OF 5/23/10. | | |
05/24/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. for an extension of time to file Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Fn1 [In light of this order, the clerk of this court shall stay issuance of the remittutur, pending our resolution of the petition.] | | 10-13424 |
05/24/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | | 10-13426 |
06/22/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC | | 10-16302 |
07/19/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 10-18134 |
07/19/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
07/26/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 22, 2010. | | 10-18134 |